Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | Prefile |