Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-12-3-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/18/2023 | Prefile |