House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House TI Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-6-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Prefile |