Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024