House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-4-3-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 12/21/2023 | Prefile |