House
|
04/17/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Toma, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1026. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (19-40-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-5-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/02/2024
|
Prefile
|
|
|