LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1034
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1034
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1034
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 4, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 28, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 28, 2024
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
April 10, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 4, 2024
Analysis
April 1, 2024
Analysis
March 28, 2024
Analysis
March 13, 2024
Analysis
March 7, 2024
Analysis
February 28, 2024
Analysis
February 8, 2024