Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1038 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Engrossed charter schools; state board; continuation. State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024 SENATE BILL 1038 An Act repealing section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.15; relating to the state board for charter schools. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+PREFILED JAN 04 2024 REFERENCE TITLE: charter schools; state board; continuation. State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024 SB 1038 Introduced by Senators Bennett: Marsh, Wadsack An Act repealing section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3034.01; relating to the state board for charter schools. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
22
33
44
55
66
7+PREFILED JAN 04 2024
78
9+REFERENCE TITLE: charter schools; state board; continuation.
10+State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
11+SB 1038
12+Introduced by Senators Bennett: Marsh, Wadsack
813
9-Senate Engrossed charter schools; state board; continuation.
10-State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
11-SENATE BILL 1038
12-
13-Senate Engrossed
14-
15-
16-
17-charter schools; state board; continuation.
14+REFERENCE TITLE: charter schools; state board; continuation.
1815
1916
2017
2118
2219
2320
2421
2522
2623
2724 State of Arizona
2825
2926 Senate
3027
3128 Fifty-sixth Legislature
3229
3330 Second Regular Session
3431
3532 2024
3633
3734
3835
3936
4037
4138
4239
43-SENATE BILL 1038
40+SB 1038
41+
42+
43+
44+Introduced by
45+
46+Senators Bennett: Marsh, Wadsack
47+
48+
49+
50+
51+
52+
53+
54+
4455
4556
4657
4758
4859
4960
5061
5162
5263
5364 An Act
5465
5566
5667
57-repealing section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.15; relating to the state board for charter schools.
68+repealing section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3034.01; relating to the state board for charter schools.
5869
5970
6071
6172
6273
6374 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6475
6576
6677
67- Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.15, to read: START_STATUTE41-3032.15. State board for charter schools; termination July 1, 2032 A. The state board for charter schools terminates on July 1, 2032. B. Section 15-182 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board for charter schools to: 1. Grant charter status to qualifying applicants for charter schools that are sponsored by the state board for charter schools. 2. Exercise general supervision over charter schools sponsored by the state board for charter schools. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.
78+ Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3034.01, to read: START_STATUTE41-3034.01. State board for charter schools; termination July 1, 2034 A. The state board for charter schools terminates on July 1, 2034. B. Section 15-182 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2035. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board for charter schools to: 1. Grant charter status to qualifying applicants for charter schools that are sponsored by the state board for charter schools. 2. Exercise general supervision over charter schools sponsored by the state board for charter schools. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.
6879
6980 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
7081
7182 Section 1. Repeal
7283
7384 Section 41-3024.15, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
7485
75-Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.15, to read:
86+Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3034.01, to read:
7687
77-START_STATUTE41-3032.15. State board for charter schools; termination July 1, 2032
88+START_STATUTE41-3034.01. State board for charter schools; termination July 1, 2034
7889
79-A. The state board for charter schools terminates on July 1, 2032.
90+A. The state board for charter schools terminates on July 1, 2034.
8091
81-B. Section 15-182 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033. END_STATUTE
92+B. Section 15-182 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2035. END_STATUTE
8293
8394 Sec. 3. Purpose
8495
8596 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the state board for charter schools to:
8697
8798 1. Grant charter status to qualifying applicants for charter schools that are sponsored by the state board for charter schools.
8899
89100 2. Exercise general supervision over charter schools sponsored by the state board for charter schools.
90101
91102 Sec. 4. Retroactivity
92103
93104 Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.