Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Senate miscellaneous motion: At the request of the House, Senate Bill 1047 was returned to the House of Representatives for the purpose of reconsideration.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Motion by Representative Martinez that the House request the Senate to return SB1047 for the purpose of reconsideration. Passed by vv
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1047 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (26-27-6-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Shope moved that the Senate request the House of Representatives return SB 1047 which was passed by the Senate and transmitted to the House of Representatives on February 22, 2024 for the purpose of reconsideration. Motion carried.
February 26, 2024 the House returned SB 1047.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|