Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024