Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 18, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024