Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |