Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1070 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024