Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 23, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis April 2, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 24, 2024