Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis July 8, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024