Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate motion to reconsider third reading | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (10-18-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |