Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1092 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 29, 2024
Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024