Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1093 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024