Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1095 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024