|
04/16/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
04/10/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-10-4-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|