Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024