Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Bill January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024