Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1163 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 14, 2024
Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis April 1, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024