Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024