Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 19, 2024
Analysis June 12, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024