House
|
03/25/2024
|
House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (17-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House LARA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|