Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate ELEC Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |