Assigned to TTMC FOR COMMITTEE ARIZONA STATE SENATE Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1184 continuation; department of transportation Purpose Continues the Arizona Department of Transportation (ADOT) for four years. Background Established in 1973 to provide an integrated and balanced state transportation system, ADOT is granted the exclusive control and jurisdiction over state highways and routes, state-owned airports and all state-owned transportation systems and must register motor vehicles and aircrafts, license drivers, collect revenues, enforce motor vehicle and aviation statutes and perform related transportation planning functions. In order to carry out these responsibilities, ADOT is organized into six divisions: 1) motor vehicle; 2) transportation planning; 3) highways; 4) aeronautics; 5) public transit; and 6) administrative services. ADOT also works cooperatively with regional transportation planning organizations, as well as county and local authorities, on transportation-related projects and development (A.R.S. §§ 28-331 and 28-332). ADOT receives funding through legislative appropriation, non-appropriated funds and federal funds, as well as private sources, including donations and fees. ADOT's operating budget for FY 2025 includes $251,996,900 and 3,402 full-time equivalent positions (JLBC). The Joint Senate Transportation and Technology and House of Representatives Transportation and Infrastructure Committee of Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 4, 2024, to receive public testimony and review and evaluate ADOT's response to the sunset review factors and special audits conducted by the Office of the Auditor General. The COR recommended that ADOT be continued for four to six years (COR Report). ADOT terminates on July 1, 2024, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.25). There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this legislation. Provisions 1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, ADOT until July 1, 2028. 2. Repeals ADOT on January 1, 2029. 3. Contains a purpose statement. 4. Makes conforming changes. 5. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision, as noted. Prepared by Senate Research February 1, 2024 KJA/slp