Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024