Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 24, 2024
Analysis March 1, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024