Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024