Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024