Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024