House | 02/29/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |