|
03/04/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
02/28/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Montenegro that the House suspend Rules 8, 32 and 36 and notwithstanding any other House Rule, Senate Bill 1231 be discharged from standing committees, bypass Committee of the Whole and be placed under the order of business, Third Reading of Bills for today. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|