House
|
06/14/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-3-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|