Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1254 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/05/2024

                    Assigned to HHS 	AS PASSED BY COW 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, Second Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1254 
 
nursing care; assisted living; continuation 
Purpose 
Continues the Board of Examiners of Nursing Care Institution Administrators and Assisted 
Living Facility Managers (NCIA Board) for eight years. Requires, by June 15, 2026, the NCIA 
Board, the Department of Health Services (DHS) and the Arizona Health Care Cost Containment 
System (AHCCCS) to collaborate on updating training standards and programs for caregivers, 
assisted living facility managers and nursing care institution administrators. 
Background 
The NCIA Board regulates nursing care institution administrators and assisted living 
facility managers in Arizona. NCIA Board duties include: 1) adopting rules for licensing and 
certifying qualified applicants; 2) conducting examinations to determine applicant qualification; 
3) adopting application, certification and examination fees; 4) conducting investigations or 
administrative hearings in response to complaints; 5) prescribing standards for assisted living 
facility training programs; 6) meeting biannually;  and 7) reporting to the Legislature (A.R.S.  
§ 36-446.03).  
The NCIA Board consists of 11 members appointed by the Governor, including: 1) one 
administrator who holds an active license in nursing care institution administration; 2) one 
manager who holds an active license in assisted living facility management; 3) one administrator 
of a nonprofit or faith-based skilled nursing facility; 4) one administrator of a proprietary skilled 
nursing facility; 5) two managers of an assisted living center; 6) one manager of an assisted living 
home; 7) two public members who are not affiliated with a nursing care institution or an assisted 
living facility; 8) one public member who represents an organization that advocates for the elderly; 
and 9) one person who is a family member of a resident in either a skilled nursing facility or an 
assisted living facility at the time the person is appointed. Members are appointed to two-year 
terms for members not affiliated with a nursing care institution or an assisted living facility, and 
three-year terms for members who are administrators of a nursing care institution or the manager 
of an assisted living facility. Active members may not serve on any other regulatory board relating 
to long-term care or serve more than two consecutive terms (A.R.S. § 36-446.02). 
The Senate Health and Human Services Committee of Reference (COR) held a public 
meeting on January 11, 2024, to review and evaluate the NCIA Board's response to the sunset 
review factors and receive public testimony. The COR recommended that the NCIA Board be 
continued for eight years until July 1, 2032 (COR Report). The NCIA Board is set to terminate on 
July 1, 2024, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. § 41-3024.03).  
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.   FACT SHEET – Amended  
S.B. 1254 
Page 2 
 
 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, the NCIA Board until July 1, 2032. 
2. Repeals the NCIA Board on January 1, 2033. 
3. Requires, by June 15, 2026, the NCIA Board, DHS and AHCCCS to: 
a) collaborate to update training programs, oversight and standards for caregivers, assisted 
living facility managers and nursing care institution administrators; 
b) form an advisory workgroup to inform the NCIA Board's and agencies' efforts; and 
c) recommend the appropriate board or agency to oversee the training standards, program 
approval, program oversight and implementation date. 
4. Contains a purpose statement. 
5. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with a retroactive provision as noted.  
Amendments Adopted by Committee of the Whole 
• Requires, by June 15, 2026, the NCIA Board, DHS and AHCCCS to: 
a) collaborate to update training programs, oversight and standards for caregivers, assisted 
living facility managers and nursing care institution administrators; 
b) form an advisory workgroup to inform the NCIA Board's and agencies' efforts; and 
c) recommend the appropriate board or agency to oversee the training standards, program 
approval, program oversight and implementation date. 
Senate Action 
HHS 2/20/24 DP 7-0-0 
Prepared by Senate Research 
March 5, 2024 
MM/DM/slp