Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1254 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Engrossed nursing care; assisted living; continuation State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024 CHAPTER 159 SENATE BILL 1254 An Act repealing section 41-3024.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.03; relating to the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+Senate Engrossed nursing care; assisted living; continuation State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024 SENATE BILL 1254 An Act repealing section 41-3024.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.03; relating to the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
2+
3+
24
35
46
57
68
79 Senate Engrossed nursing care; assisted living; continuation
810 State of Arizona Senate Fifty-sixth Legislature Second Regular Session 2024
9-CHAPTER 159
1011 SENATE BILL 1254
1112
1213 Senate Engrossed
1314
1415
1516
1617 nursing care; assisted living; continuation
18+
19+
1720
1821
1922
2023
2124
2225
2326
2427 State of Arizona
2528
2629 Senate
2730
2831 Fifty-sixth Legislature
2932
3033 Second Regular Session
3134
3235 2024
3336
3437
3538
3639
3740
3841
3942
40-CHAPTER 159
43+SENATE BILL 1254
4144
4245
43-
44-SENATE BILL 1254
4546
4647
4748
4849
4950
5051
5152
5253 An Act
5354
5455
5556
5657 repealing section 41-3024.03, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3032.03; relating to the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers.
5758
5859
5960
6061
6162
6263 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6364
6465
6566
6667 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3024.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.03, to read: START_STATUTE41-3032.03. Board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers; termination July 1, 2032 A. The board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers terminates on July 1, 2032. B. Title 36, chapter 4, article 6 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033.END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers; updating training standards; training programs; oversight On or before June 15, 2026, the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers, the department of health services and the Arizona health care cost containment system shall: 1. Collaborate to update the caregiver, assisted living facility manager and nursing care institution administrator training standards, training programs and training program oversight required by section 36-446.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, and to form an advisory workgroup to inform the board's and agencies' efforts. 2. Recommend the appropriate board or agency to oversee the training standards, training program approval and training program oversight and a date for the implementation. Sec. 4. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers to promote the safe and professional regulation of nursing care institutions and assisted living facilities in this state. Sec. 5. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.
6768
6869 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6970
7071 Section 1. Repeal
7172
7273 Section 41-3024.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
7374
7475 Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3032.03, to read:
7576
7677 START_STATUTE41-3032.03. Board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers; termination July 1, 2032
7778
7879 A. The board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers terminates on July 1, 2032.
7980
8081 B. Title 36, chapter 4, article 6 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2033.END_STATUTE
8182
8283 Sec. 3. Board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers; updating training standards; training programs; oversight
8384
8485 On or before June 15, 2026, the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers, the department of health services and the Arizona health care cost containment system shall:
8586
8687 1. Collaborate to update the caregiver, assisted living facility manager and nursing care institution administrator training standards, training programs and training program oversight required by section 36-446.03, Arizona Revised Statutes, and to form an advisory workgroup to inform the board's and agencies' efforts.
8788
8889 2. Recommend the appropriate board or agency to oversee the training standards, training program approval and training program oversight and a date for the implementation.
8990
9091 Sec. 4. Purpose
9192
9293 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the board of examiners of nursing care institution administrators and assisted living facility managers to promote the safe and professional regulation of nursing care institutions and assisted living facilities in this state.
9394
9495 Sec. 5. Retroactivity
9596
9697 Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2024.
97-
98- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024.
99-
100-
101-
102-
103-
104-
105-
106-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 16, 2024.
107-
108-
109-
110-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 16, 2024.