Arizona 2024 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1254 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/21/2024

                      	SB 1254 
Initials AG/ KT 	Page 1 	Caucus & COW 
 
ARIZONA HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
Fifty-sixth Legislature 
Second Regular Session 
Senate: HHS DP 7-0-0-0 | 3
rd
 Read 24-5-1-0 
House: HHS DP 9-1-0-0 
 
SB 1254: nursing care; assisted living; continuation 
Sponsor: Senator Shope, LD 16 
Caucus & COW 
Overview 
Continues the Arizona State Board of Examiners of Nursing Care Institution Administrators 
and Assisted Living Facility Managers (NCIA Board) for 8 years. Tasks the NCIA Board, the 
Arizona Department of Health Services (DHS) and the Arizona Health Care Cost 
Containment System (AHCCCS) with collaborating on updating training standards and 
programs for caregivers, assisted living facility managers and nursing care institution 
administrators by June 15, 2026. 
History 
The NCIA Board was created to regulate nursing care institution administrators and assisted 
living facility managers in Arizona. Responsibilities of the NCIA Board include: 1) adopting 
rules for licensing and certifying qualified applicants; 2) conducting examinations to 
determine applicant qualification; 3) adopting application, certification and examination 
fees; 4) conducting investigations or administrative hearings in response to complaints; 5) 
prescribing standards for assisted living facility training programs; and 6) reporting to the 
Legislature (A.R.S. § 36-446.03). 
The NCIA Board consists of 11 members appointed by the Governor including: 1) one 
administrator who holds an active license in nursing care institution administration; 2) one 
manager who holds an active license in assisted living facility management; 3) one 
administrator of a nonprofit or faith-based skilled nursing facility; 4) one administrator of a 
proprietary skilled nursing facility; 5) two managers of an assisted living center; 6) one 
manager of an assisted living home; 7) two public members who are not affiliated with a 
nursing care institution or an assisted living facility; 8) one public member who represents 
an organization that advocates for the elderly; and 9) one person who is a family member of 
a resident in either a skilled nursing facility or an assisted living facility at the time the 
person is appointed to the NCIA Board. Members are appointed to two-year terms for 
members not affiliated with a nursing care institution or an assisted living facility, and three-
year terms for members who are administrators of a nursing care institution or the manager 
of an assisted living facility. Members may not serve more than two consecutive terms (A.R.S. 
§ 36-446.02). 
The Senate Health and Human Services and House Health & Human Services Committees 
of Reference met jointly on January 11, 2024, to conduct a review of the NCIA Board. Both 
Committees of Reference recommended the NCIA Board be continued for eight years (COR 
Report). 
    	SB 1254 
Initials AG/ KT 	Page 2 	Caucus & COW 
 
Provisions 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2024, the NCIA Board until July 1, 2032. (Sec. 2, 5) 
2. Repeals the NCIA Board on January 1, 2033. (Sec. 2) 
3. Directs the NCIA Board, DHS and AHCCCS by June 15, 2026, to:  
a) collaborate to update the caregiver, assisted living facility manager and nursing care 
institution administrator training standards, training programs and training 
program oversight; 
b) form an advisory workgroup to inform the NCIA Board and agencies' efforts; and 
c) recommend the appropriate board or agency to oversee the training standards, 
training program approval, training program oversight and a date for the 
implementation. (Sec. 3) 
4. Contains a purpose statement. (Sec. 4) 
5. Makes a conforming change. (Sec. 1) 
 
☐ Prop 105 (45 votes)     ☐ Prop 108 (40 votes)      ☐ Emergency (40 votes) ☐ Fiscal Note