Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024