Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1270 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 18, 2024