Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Chaptered

Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis March 4, 2024
Analysis March 1, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024