Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024