LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1295
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1295
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2024 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1295
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
March 18, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note
February 20, 2024
Bill
January 24, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
June 4, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 15, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 14, 2024
Analysis
March 21, 2024
Analysis
February 29, 2024
Analysis
February 21, 2024
Analysis
February 2, 2024