House | 02/26/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |