Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 10, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024