Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024