House | 03/18/2024 | House MAPS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-13-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |