Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1311 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 19, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill April 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 5, 2024
Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024