Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-16-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |